EP3854663 - STEERING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba, 3-Chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takafumi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
TOKO, Takahiro c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
KATAOKA, Nobuaki c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
EZAKI, Yukinobu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21153140.5 | 25.01.2021 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | JP20200010559 | 27.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020010559 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854663 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3854663 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B62D5/0469 (EP,US);
B62D6/00 (CN);
B62D15/0215 (US);
B62D5/00 (CN);
B62D5/04 (CN);
B62D5/0409 (US);
B62D5/0463 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LENKUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/30] | English: | STEERING CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DIRECTION | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102015102630 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006] , [0030] , [0041] - [0057]; figures 1-7; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2016221601 (BARTHOMEUF JULIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0052] - [0059] - [0069] - [0072]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2016155519 |