EP3890437 - INDUCTION HEATING TYPE COOKTOP WITH OUTPUT CONTROL ALGORITHM BASED ON TEMPERATURE OF MULTIPLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Chuhyoung LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
SON, Seongho LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
KWACK, Younghwan LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Seonho LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
JI, Jongseong LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21153658.6 | 27.01.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | KR20200040239 | 02.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200040239 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890437 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06, H05B6/12 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
H05B6/1236 (EP);
H05B6/062 (EP,KR);
H05B6/1272 (US);
G05D23/22 (KR);
H05B1/02 (KR);
H05B6/065 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSKOCHFELD MIT AUSGANGSSTEUERALGORITHMUS AUF BASIS DER TEMPERATUR MEHRERER KOMPONENTEN | [2021/40] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING TYPE COOKTOP WITH OUTPUT CONTROL ALGORITHM BASED ON TEMPERATURE OF MULTIPLE COMPONENTS | [2021/40] | French: | TABLE DE CUISSON DE TYPE CHAUFFAGE À INDUCTION AVEC ALGORITHME DE COMMANDE DE SORTIE BASÉ SUR LA TEMPÉRATURE DE PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2002056959 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] *; | [I]EP1437920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0022] - [0023] *; | [I]US2005205561 (KEISHIMA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] * | by applicant | JPS5630495B | US6770857 | JP2008311058 |