EP3920067 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MACHINE LEARNING MODEL TESTING AND PREVENTIVE MEASURE RECOMMENDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUKLA, Manish 411013 Hadapsar, Pune / IN | 02 /
VASU, Rosni Kottekulam 411 013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
LODHA, Sachin Premsukh 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
Seetharaman, Sanjay 600101 Chennai, Tamil Nadu / IN | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21153900.2 | 28.01.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | IN202021022987 | 01.06.2020 Original published format: IN202021022987 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920067 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3920067 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G06F21/577 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06F2221/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM TESTEN EINES MASCHINENLERNMODELLS UND ZUR EMPFEHLUNG VORBEUGENDER MASSNAHMEN | [2021/49] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MACHINE LEARNING MODEL TESTING AND PREVENTIVE MEASURE RECOMMENDATION | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TEST D'UN MODÈLE D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR MACHINE ET DE RECOMMANDATION DE MESURE PRÉVENTIVE | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018150728 (VAHDAT ARASH [CA]); | [I]US2019318099 (CARVALHO WILKA [US], et al); | [I]US2020050945 (CHEN BRYANT [US], et al) |