EP3858757 - DEVICE FOR WEDGING AN OBJECT MADE OF CELLULAR CARDBOARD AND CORRUGATED CARDBOARD AND CORRESPONDING PACKAGING BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smurfit Kappa France 5 Avenue Du Gal De Gaulle 94160 St Mande / FR | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTOS, Eric Le Charme n°6 37110 Morand / FR | 02 /
PUISSANT, Sabrina 2 Allée Guy de Maupassant 51100 REIMS / FR | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Fédit-Loriot 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21153945.7 | 28.01.2021 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | FR20200000823 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000823 | [2021/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858757 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/02 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B65D65/44 (EP);
B65D81/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERKEILEN EINES GEGENSTANDES AUS WABENKARTON UND WELLPAPPE UND ENTSPRECHENDER VERPACKUNGSKARTON | [2021/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR WEDGING AN OBJECT MADE OF CELLULAR CARDBOARD AND CORRUGATED CARDBOARD AND CORRESPONDING PACKAGING BOX | [2021/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CALAGE D'OBJET EN CARTON ALVEOLAIRE ET CARTON ONDULE ET BOÎTE DE CONDITIONNEMENT CORRESPONDANTE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 01.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5462171 (MOOG JOHN F [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figures 2-3 *; | [Y]KR20040098544 (SIM GYU YEOL) [Y] 3,6,7 * figures 3-8 *; | [A]US2006000547 (ROBERGE JEAN-LOUIS [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2008086982 (PARENTEAU MARTIN [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figure 11 *; | [XYI]KR20110010366 (CHEIL IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0026]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,6-8[I] 5,9,10; | [YA]US2012031957 (WHITAKER MARK [US]) [Y] 3,6,7 * figure 11 * [A] 1; | [Y]US2017327298 (MORASSE STEPHANE [CA], et al) [Y] 3,6,7 * figure 6 * |