EP3872941 - OPERATING UNIT FOR AN EARTHING SWITCH OF AN AIR-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karadeniz, Tahsin Karasu Cd., Akse Mh., Yasam Sit No: 24, Daire: 17 41400 Gebze-Kocaeli / TR | 02 /
Sakaci, Egemen Aslan 46 Çamlik Sk. 34870 Karliktepe Mah. KARTAL ISTANBUL / TR | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21154083.6 | 28.01.2021 | [2021/35] | Priority number, date | DE202010202595 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020202595 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872941 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3872941 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/28, // H02B11/10 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H02B11/28 (EP);
H02B11/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEDIENEINHEIT FÜR EINEN ERDUNGSSCHALTERANTRIEB EINER LUFTISOLIERTEN SCHALTANLAGE | [2021/35] | English: | OPERATING UNIT FOR AN EARTHING SWITCH OF AN AIR-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR | [2021/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR UN SECTIONNEUR DE TERRE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE COMMUTATION ISOLÉE PAR AIR | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 01.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | LU | 28.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]AT271612B (KRONE KG) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 39 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2-5; | [XAI]DE9014832U (-) [X] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 20 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2,3,5; | [XAI]DE29904223U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 6 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2,3,5; | [A]WO2008087723 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 6-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] ** figures 3-8 *; | [XAI]EP2787519 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0004] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2-5 |