EP3859714 - QUANTITATIVE PILOT EVALUATION DURING TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONUR, Can The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
VAN GILS, Pieter The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
VAN BRUCHEM, Barend-Jan The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | [2021/41] |
Former [2021/31] | 01 /
ONUR, Can The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | ||
02 /
VAN GILS, Pieter The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
03 /
VAN BRUCHUM, Barend-Jan The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza CHICAGO, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 21154431.7 | 29.01.2021 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | US202016777590 | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US202016777590 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3859714 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3859714 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/08, G09B19/16, // G09B9/44 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G09B9/08 (EP);
G09B9/12 (US);
G09B19/165 (EP);
G09B9/10 (US);
G09B9/206 (US);
G09B9/302 (US);
G09B9/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUANTITATIVE PILOTENBEWERTUNG WÄHREND DES TRAININGS | [2021/31] | English: | QUANTITATIVE PILOT EVALUATION DURING TRAINING | [2021/31] | French: | ÉVALUATION QUANTITATIVE DU PILOTE PENDANT LA FORMATION | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 07.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |