EP3861860 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF RUSK SLICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARILLA G. e R. Fratelli S.p.A. Via Mantova, 166 43100 Parma / IT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASOTTI, Valentina Viale Pelacani, 20 43123 Parma / IT | 02 /
CELLI, Silvia Via Vivaldi, 5 43022 Montechiarugolo (PR) / IT | 03 /
GIOVANETTI, Marco Via Flavio D'Angelo, 4 43122 Parma / IT | 04 /
MEZZADRI, Paolo - deceased / IT | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/32] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21154515.7 | 01.02.2021 | [2021/32] | Priority number, date | IT20200002122 | 04.02.2020 Original published format: IT202000002122 | [2021/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861860 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3861860 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/06, A21D13/40, A21D13/80, A21C15/00, A47J37/08, A21D15/04 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A21D8/06 (EP);
A21C15/00 (EP);
A21D13/40 (EP);
A47J37/0892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWIEBACK SCHEIBEN | [2021/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF RUSK SLICES | [2021/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE TRANCHES DE BISCOTTES | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 03.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 13.12.2023 | [2024/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB900292 (HOOIMEIJER EN ZONEN N V A); | [A]DD237607 (TSCHEUSCHNER HORST D, et al); | [A]WO2009021310 (AREND KARSTEN ACHIM RICHARD [CA]); | [A]US2013295234 (CULP CHRISTOPHER PATRICK [US]); |