EP4014882 - ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC APPARATUS AND PROBE FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xidong 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 21154887.0 | 03.02.2021 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | WO2020CN137507 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/137507 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014882 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61B8/4444 (EP);
A61B8/4281 (EP);
A61B8/4461 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLDIAGNOSEGERÄT UND SONDE DAFÜR | [2022/25] | English: | ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC APPARATUS AND PROBE FOR THE SAME | [2022/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR ULTRASONS ET SA SONDE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007220977 (HART JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1,15* paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1,5 *; | [XI]EP1878388 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0034] - [0039] - [0042]; figures 2-7 * [I] 15; | [A]US2010234734 (CHO JOO YEON [KR]) [A] 1,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0017] - [0021] - [0025] - [0036] - [0074]; figures 1-5 * |