EP3838311 - ANTI-OCCLUSION INTRAVENOUS TUBE PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLABY, Jiri 970 Indian Spring Lane Buffalo Grove, IL Illinois 60089 / US | 02 /
MAERZKE, James Thomas 3810 60th Place Kenosha, WI Wisconsin 53142 / US | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21154944.9 | 27.12.2017 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | US201662440738P | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662440738 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838311 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/168, A61M39/28 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M39/288 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M39/08 (CN,KR);
A61M5/14228 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M5/16831 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M2005/16863 (CN,KR);
A61M2206/20 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | OKKLUSIONSSCHUTZPORT FÜR INTRAVENÖSEN SCHLAUCH | [2021/25] | English: | ANTI-OCCLUSION INTRAVENOUS TUBE PORT | [2021/25] | French: | ORIFICE DE TUBE INTRAVEINEUX ANTI-OCCLUSION | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17832686.4 / EP3562531 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4257422 (DUNCAN PATRICIA E); | [A]US4689043 (BISHA JON [US]); | [A]EP0293241 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US5215450 (TAMARI YEHUDA [US]); | [A]US5336190 (MOSS RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]JPH1037820 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP, et al) |