EP3915712 - METHOD OF OPTIMIZING WELDING PARAMETERS FOR WELDING CONTROL, METHOD OF PROVIDING A TRAINED ALGORITHM FOR MACHINE LEARNING, WELDING CONTROL, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE DATA MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/48] | METHOD OF OPTIMIZING WELDING PARAMETERS FOR WELDING CONTROL, METHOD FOR PROVIDING A TRAINED ALGORITHM FOR MACHINE LEARNING AND WELDING CONTROL | ||
[2022/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dieterle, Martin 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Shakirov, Damir 75223 Niefern-Oeschelbronn / DE | 03 /
Haeufgloeckner, Juergen 63936 Schneeberg / DE | 04 /
Bleier, Fabian 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Pychynski, Tim 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 06 /
Steimer, Andreas 75328 Schoemberg / DE | 07 /
Slavnic, Sinisa 28357 Bremen / DE | 08 /
Zhou, Baifan 71229 Leonberg / DE | 09 /
Mcconnell, Sean 69434 Hirschhorn Am Neckar / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21155363.1 | 05.02.2021 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | DE202010204522 | 08.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020204522 | [2021/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915712 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915712 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/11, B23K11/25, B23K31/00, B23K31/12, G05B19/418, G06K9/62, G06N3/08, G06N5/02 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
B23K11/11 (EP,US);
B23K11/36 (CN);
B23K11/25 (EP);
B23K31/006 (EP);
B23K31/125 (EP);
G05B13/0265 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM OPTIMIEREN VON SCHWEISSPARAMETERN FÜR EINE SCHWEISSSTEUERUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES TRAINIERTEN ALGORITHMUS MASCHINELLEN LERNENS, SCHWEISSSTEUERUNG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARER DATENTRÄGER | [2022/46] | English: | METHOD OF OPTIMIZING WELDING PARAMETERS FOR WELDING CONTROL, METHOD OF PROVIDING A TRAINED ALGORITHM FOR MACHINE LEARNING, WELDING CONTROL, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE DATA MEDIUM | [2022/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DES PARAMÈTRES DE SOUDAGE POUR UNE COMMANDE DE SOUDAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE ALGORITHME ENTRAÎNÉ, CONTRÔLEUR DE SOUDAGE, PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR, ET SUPPORT DE DONNÉES LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/48] | VERFAHREN ZUM OPTIMIEREN VON SCHWEISSPARAMETERN FÜR EINE SCHWEISSSTEUERUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES TRAINIERTEN ALGORITHMUS MASCHINELLEN LERNENS UND SCHWEISSSTEUERUNG | ||
Former [2021/48] | METHOD OF OPTIMIZING WELDING PARAMETERS FOR WELDING CONTROL, METHOD FOR PROVIDING A TRAINED ALGORITHM FOR MACHINE LEARNING AND WELDING CONTROL | ||
Former [2021/48] | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DES PARAMÈTRES DE SOUDAGE POUR UNE COMMANDE DE SOUDAGE, PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE ALGORITHME ENTRAÎNÉ ET CONTRÔLEUR DE SOUDAGE | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | IE | 05.02.2023 | LU | 05.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
IE | 05.02.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
IE | 05.02.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 25.01.2023 | |
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5764859 (KIM SANG HEE [KR], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 14, line 45 - column 15, line 45; figure - *; | [A]DE202011000875U (KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0041]; figure - *; | [A]US2013193123 (SAINT-MARTIN JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0186] - [0193]; figure - *; | [Y]US2018322623 (MEMO ALVISE [IT], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0153] - [0154]; figure - *; | [Y]CN109886298 (UNIV JIANGSU) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020096970 (MEHR EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * paragraphs [0141] - [0163]; figure - * | Examination | KR20190070049 | by applicant | DE10334478 |