EP3862569 - RECOVERY FROM GAS TURBINE COMPRESSOR SURGE USING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMERO, Michael M. 400 Main Street East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06118 / US | 02 /
COLLOPY, Gary 400 Main Street East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06118 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 21155480.3 | 05.02.2021 | [2021/32] | Priority number, date | US202016783731 | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US202016783731 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862569 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862569 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02, F04D25/06, F02C9/00, F02C7/36, F01D15/10, F04D19/02, F04D25/04 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
F04D27/0261 (EP);
F02C9/16 (US);
F02C7/32 (US);
F02C9/28 (EP);
F04D19/026 (EP);
F04D25/04 (EP);
F04D25/06 (EP);
F04D27/0269 (EP);
F05D2220/76 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERHOLUNG VOM GASTURBINEN-VERDICHTERPUMPEN MITTELS EINES ELEKTRISCHEN MOTORS | [2021/32] | English: | RECOVERY FROM GAS TURBINE COMPRESSOR SURGE USING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2021/32] | French: | SORTIE DE POMPAGE DE COMPRESSEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017226934 (ROBIC BERNARD [FR], et al); | [XAI]US2019368500 (EPSTEIN ALAN H [US]) |