EP4039405 - A SCREWDRIVER APPARATUS FOR A ROBOTIC ARM, A METHOD OF OPERATING A SCREW DRIVER APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT CAPABLE OF BEING INSTALLED IN A ROBOTIC ARM CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/32] | ROBOTIC SCREWDRIVER AND METHOD | ||
[2022/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTIMO Robotics OÜ Allika tee 1 Rae parish Harju county Peetri 75312 / EE | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states Esteg Oû Reti tee 9 Rae Parish 75312 Peetri / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vilist, Martin 75312 Peetri / EE | 02 /
Vait, Harti 75312 Peetri / EE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ben Ben Williams IP Limited St. John's House St. John's Street Chichester, West Sussex PO19 1UU / GB | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21155709.5 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039405 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4039405 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/06, B23P19/00, B25J11/00, B25J15/00, B25B23/10 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B25B23/10 (EP);
B23P19/06 (EP,US);
B23P19/006 (EP,US);
B25J11/005 (EP);
B25J15/0019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | SCHRAUBENDREHER FÜR EINEN ROBOTERARM, EIN VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SCHRAUBENDREHERS UND EIN COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT, DAS IN EINER ROBOTERARMSTEUERUNG INSTALLIERT WERDEN KANN. | [2022/38] | English: | A SCREWDRIVER APPARATUS FOR A ROBOTIC ARM, A METHOD OF OPERATING A SCREW DRIVER APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT CAPABLE OF BEING INSTALLED IN A ROBOTIC ARM CONTROLLER | [2022/38] | French: | UN APPAREIL DE VISSAGE POUR UN BRAS ROBOTIQUE, UN PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE VISSAGE ET UN PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUVANT ÊTRE INSTALLÉ DANS UN CONTRÔLEUR DE BRAS ROBOTIQUE. | [2022/38] |
Former [2022/32] | ROBOTERSCHRAUBENDREHER UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2022/32] | ROBOTIC SCREWDRIVER AND METHOD | ||
Former [2022/32] | TOURNEVIS ROBOTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | Examination procedure | 08.02.2021 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 05.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4462283 (ITO YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [Y] 12* figure 6 *; | [XAY]US2013067711 (HARADA TOYOO [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,8-11,13-15 * figures 1,7A-8D * [A] 2 [Y] 6,12; | [YD]JP2017109259 (NITTO SEIKO KK) [YD] 6 * figures 3-6 * | Examination | US5469924 | by applicant | JP2017109259 |