EP3869413 - POOLING UNIT FOR DEEP LEARNING ACCELERATION BACKGROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | For all designated states STMicroelectronics International N.V. Chemin du Champ des Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates, Geneva / CH | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Mr. Surinder Pal J-201 Sector 25 201301 Noida / IN | 02 /
BOESCH, Mr. Thomas Via Cassina, 23 6821 Rovio / CH | 03 /
DESOLI, Mr. Giuseppe Via Fittavolo, 4 I-22042 San Fermo Della Battaglia (Como) / IT | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21155904.2 | 09.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | US202016799671 | 24.02.2020 Original published format: US202016799671 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869413 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3869413 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06N3/0464, G06N3/045, G06T1/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06F17/18 (US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | G06N3/04, G06N3/063, G06T1/20, G06F17/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | POOLING-EINHEIT ZUR BESCHLEUNIGUNG VON TIEFENLERNEN | [2021/34] | English: | POOLING UNIT FOR DEEP LEARNING ACCELERATION BACKGROUND | [2021/34] | French: | UNITÉ DE REGROUPEMENT POUR ARRIÈRE-PLAN D'ACCÉLÉRATION D'APPRENTISSAGE PROFOND | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 16.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018315155 (PARK SUNG HEE [US], et al); | [XD]US2019266485 (SINGH SURINDER PAL [IN], et al); | [X]WO2019227322 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | US2021073569 [ ] (GAO MINGMING [CN], et al) | by applicant | US2019266479 | US2019266485 | US2019266784 |