EP3871922 - BUFFER SUPPORTING LEG AND CHILD SAFETY SEAT ASSEMBLY THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wonderland Switzerland AG Beim Bahnhof 5 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Zongwang No 1, Yin Hu Industrial Zone, Qing Xi Town Dongguan, Guangdong, 523648 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21156275.6 | 10.02.2021 | [2021/35] | Priority number, date | CN202020235839U | 28.02.2020 Original published format: CN 202020235839 U | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871922 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
B60N2/2824 (EP);
B60N2/2827 (EP);
B60N2/2887 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUFFERSTÜTZBEIN UND KINDERSICHERHEITSSITZANORDNUNG DAMIT | [2021/35] | English: | BUFFER SUPPORTING LEG AND CHILD SAFETY SEAT ASSEMBLY THEREWITH | [2021/35] | French: | PIED DE SUPPORT DE TAMPON ET ENSEMBLE SIÈGE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR ENFANT CORRESPONDANT | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 23.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102012100072 (WONDERLAND NURSERY GOODS [HK]) [X] 1-16* paragraph [0043]; figure - * |