EP3868551 - BACKING LAYER FOR CONSTRUCTION INSULATING PANELS INCLUDING A COATING WITH WATER REPELLENCE AND FIRE RESISTANCE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elements S.r.l. Via Postumia Ovest 226 Frazione Olmi 31048 San Biagio di Callalta (TV) / IT | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAOTTO, Ugo c/o ELEMENTS S.R.L. Via Postumia Ovest, 226 Frazione Olmi 31048 San Biagio di Callalta, Treviso / IT | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Pennacchio, Salvatore Giovanni, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21156349.9 | 10.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | IT20200003257 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: IT202000003257 | [2021/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868551 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B5/18, B32B5/24, B60R13/08, E04C2/24, E04B1/94 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP);
E04C2/246 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2266/0228 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2266/0285 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2307/304 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/73 (EP);
B32B2419/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKSCHICHT FÜR BAUDÄMMPLATTE MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG MIT WASSERABWEISENDEN UND FEUERBESTÄNDIGEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2021/34] | English: | BACKING LAYER FOR CONSTRUCTION INSULATING PANELS INCLUDING A COATING WITH WATER REPELLENCE AND FIRE RESISTANCE PROPERTIES | [2021/34] | French: | COUCHE DE SUPPORT POUR UN PANNEAU ISOLANT DE CONSTRUCTION COMPRENANT UN REVÊTEMENT AVEC DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'HYDROFUGATION ET DE RÉSISTANCE AU FEU | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 22.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006202176 (KOYAMA AI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2013098781 (SILCART S P A [IT]); | [Y]US2018236754 (SCHILLINGS HANS [DE], et al); | [Y]WO2018169851 (HANWHA AZDEL INC [US]); | [Y]CN109467997 (LI JINLIAN); | [YA]WO2019207446 (ELEMENTS S R L [IT]) |