EP3866397 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANGING NETWORK CONFIGURATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Sangsoo c/o 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 21156598.1 | 11.02.2021 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | KR20200019108 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200019108 | KR20200034684 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200034684 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866397 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3866397 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/08 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04L41/08 (EP);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W60/04 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W8/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÄNDERN DER NETZWERKKONFIGURATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANGING NETWORK CONFIGURATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MODIFICATION DE RÉSEAU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 29.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23195436.3 / EP4262165 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Procedures for the 5G System (5GS); Stage 2 (Release 16)", vol. SA WG2, no. V16.3.0, (20191222), pages 1 - 558, 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 23.502, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/Specs/archive/23_series/23.502/23502-g30.zip 23502-g30.docx, (20191222), XP051840932 [X] 1,5,9,12 * 4.17.9 Delegated service discovery when NF service consumer and NF service producer are in same PLMN; 5.2.7.3 Nnrf_NFDiscovery service, 5.2.7.3.1 General * [Y] 3,4,7,8,11,14,15 [I] 4,8,11,15 | [Y] - ERICSSON, "Reselection clarification", vol. SA WG2, no. Sapporo, Japan; 20190624 - 20190628, (20190618), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1906969_CR_501_RESELECTION CLARIFICATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F134%5FSapporo/Docs/S2%2D1906969%2Ezip, (20190618), XP051751949 [Y] 3,4,7,8,11,14,15 * 6.3.1 General * | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "eSBA communication schema Model C", vol. SA WG2, no. Kochi, India; 20190121 - 20190125, (20190124), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1901162-WASS2-1900561-CR_502_NF COMS_MODELC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/SA2/Docs/S2%2D1901162%2Ezip, (20190124), XP051595724 [A] 1-15 * 4.y.x Service discovery with Two step selection method * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Clarification related to Subscription data type", vol. SA WG2, no. Montreal, Canada; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180213), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-181527 (WAS 1340)_23.502_SUBSCRIPTION TYPE CLARIFICATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F126%5FMontreal/Docs/, (20180213), XP051408079 [A] 1-15 * 4.2.2.2.3 Registration with AMF re-allocation * | [A] - DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG? ET AL, "Introduction of indirect communication between NF services, and implicit discovery", vol. SA WG2, no. Santa Cruz, Tenerife, Spain; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190219), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1901515-WAS-S2-1901378-23.501-CR0736-INDIRECT-COMMUNICATION-AND-IMPLICIT-DISCOVERY-REV4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F131%5FTenerife/Docs/S2%2D1901515%2Ezip, (20190219), XP051597550 [A] 1-15 * Changes in Rev4; 6.3.1 General; Annex X; * |