EP4043673 - CARTRIDGE FILTER SYSTEM CONTAINED IN A FLEXIBLE BAG AND VACUUM CLEANER PROVIDED WITH SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kokido Development Limited Unit 1319 Sunbeam Centre 27 Shing Yip Street Kwun Tong 999077 Kowloon / HK | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNEEL, Jean 999077 KOWLOON / HK | 02 /
ROUMAGNAC, Max 33127 MARTIGNAS SUR JALLE / FR | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21156656.7 | 11.02.2021 | [2022/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043673 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/16, B01D39/08 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
E04H4/1636 (EP,CN,US);
B01D29/11 (US);
B01D29/15 (EP);
B01D29/21 (CN);
B01D35/30 (US);
E04H4/1654 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2201/0415 (EP);
B01D2201/202 (EP);
B01D2201/291 (EP);
B01D2239/1208 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERSYSTEM MIT KARTUSCHE, DIE IN EINEM FLEXIBLEN BEUTEL ENTHALTEN IST, UND MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SYSTEM AUSGESTATTETER STAUBSAUGER | [2022/33] | English: | CARTRIDGE FILTER SYSTEM CONTAINED IN A FLEXIBLE BAG AND VACUUM CLEANER PROVIDED WITH SUCH A SYSTEM | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION À CARTOUCHE CONTENUE DANS UNE POCHE SOUPLE ET ASPIRATEUR ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL SYSTÈME | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5338446 (SCHUMAN MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [X]US2008283456 (CHARLOTIN SADEL [US]) | by applicant | FR2683845 | FR2715960 | US10711475 | EP3744927 |