EP3879130 - MOUNTING DEVICE FOR COVER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECE GmbH Hollefeldstrasse 57 48282 Emsdetten / DE | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meiermann, André Flothfeld 199 48159 Münster / DE | 02 /
Krabbe, Martin Entrup 2 48341 Altenberge / DE | 03 /
Schnippe, Timo Geschwister-Scholl-Straße 3 48493 Wettringen / DE | 04 /
Rottwinkel, Sven Altemarktstraße 81 48565 Steinfurt / DE | 05 /
Backherms, Florian Albert-Deitering-Str. 33 48488 Emsbüren / DE | 06 /
Heitjans, Julian Brandskamp 25 48282 Emsdetten / DE | 07 /
Wagner, Utz Hegerskamp 107 48155 Münster / DE | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21157796.0 | 18.02.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | DE202010106458 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020106458 | [2021/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879130 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B37/08 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
F16B37/0864 (EP);
E03D5/028 (EP);
F16B37/044 (EP);
F16B37/0821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEEINRICHTUNG FÜR ABDECKPLATTE | [2021/37] | English: | MOUNTING DEVICE FOR COVER PLATE | [2021/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE POUR PLAQUE DE RECOUVREMENT | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2640336 (JOUVE DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1,6,7,10-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5749691 (CAMPBELL DAVID [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,10-14 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1-5 * [I] 15; | [XI]US6361260 (SCHIRRMACHER WENDELL E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-14 * column 3 - column 6; figures 1-9 * [I] 15,16; | [A]DE202008007513U (EISENBERG GMBH SANITAERTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,15,16* the whole document * |