EP3868703 - FILLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shibuya Corporation 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-8681 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishino, Yukinobu c/o SHIBUYA CORPORATION 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa, 920-8681 / JP | 02 /
Kitayama, Taro c/o SHIBUYA CORPORATION 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa, 920-8681 / JP | 03 /
Kamori, Shinya c/o SHIBUYA CORPORATION 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa, 920-8681 / JP | 04 /
Kiba, Mizuho c/o SHIBUYA CORPORATION 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa, 920-8681 / JP | 05 /
Yonemura, Yuichi c/o SHIBUYA CORPORATION 58, Koh, Mamedahonmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa, 920-8681 / JP | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21157845.5 | 18.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | JP20200025650 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020025650 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868703 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868703 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/04, B67C3/06, B67C3/28 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B67C3/06 (EP);
B67C3/26 (CN);
B67C3/283 (US);
B67C3/04 (EP);
B67C3/22 (CN);
B67C3/2637 (CN);
B67C3/281 (US);
B67C3/286 (EP);
B67C2003/228 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FÜLLSYSTEM | [2021/34] | English: | FILLING SYSTEM | [2021/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REMPLISSAGE | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19640673 (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 19; figure . *; | [A]EP1584601 (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0020] - [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP3489191 (SHIBUYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [IY]WO2019245019 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-3,6 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 3,4; | EP3812343 [ ] (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] - [0 85] - [0087] - [0098] - [0100] - [0112] , [0115] * | by applicant | JPS555184B | JP2020025650 |