EP3873057 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING INVALIDITY OF ACCESS CONTROL LIST ACL RULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yongping Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 21157959.4 | 18.02.2021 | [2021/35] | Priority number, date | CN202010129353 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010129353 | [2021/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873057 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3873057 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/101 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/2535 (CN);
H04L61/5046 (CN);
H04L63/104 (US);
H04L63/108 (US);
H04L63/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER UNGÜLTIGKEIT EINER ZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNGSLISTEN-ACL-REGEL | [2021/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING INVALIDITY OF ACCESS CONTROL LIST ACL RULE | [2021/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'INVALIDITÉ DE RÈGLE ACL (LISTE DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS) | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US8478707 (ONG JOON [US], et al); | [A]CN110768934 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD); |