EP3900783 - FERRULE FOR NON-PLANAR MEDICAL DEVICE HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Medical Components, LLC 5030 Centerville Road St. Paul, MN 55127 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMBERG, Harold c/o Heraeus Medical Components, LLC 5030 Centerville Road St. Paul, MN 55127 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2021/43] | Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21158077.4 | 19.02.2021 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | US202062979572P | 21.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062979572 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900783 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3900783 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/375, H01B17/58 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
A61N1/3754 (EP,US);
H01B17/58 (EP,US);
H05K5/0247 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | A61N1/375 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | HÜLSE FÜR EIN NICHT-PLANARES GEHÄUSE EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2021/43] | English: | FERRULE FOR NON-PLANAR MEDICAL DEVICE HOUSING | [2021/43] | French: | FERRULE POUR BOÎTIER DE DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL NON PLANAIRE | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23183460.7 / EP4226968 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7035076 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1 * figures 2,12,16 * [I] 2-6; | [XI]US2007217121 (FU RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,7,8 * [I] 2-6; | [XI]US2012309237 (MARZANO THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 2-6; | [XI]US2015165220 (MARKHAM JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [I] 2-6; | [XI]US2019290921 (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,12,15,16,18-22A,25A-26,27,29,30-32C,40-41A * * figures 46C-50 *[I] 2-6 |