EP3881740 - DRYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Hyun Sun c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung Yup c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Sang Yoon c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
Oh, Byung Soo c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
Jeon, Hyun-Joo c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 06 /
Cheon, So Ra c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 07 /
Yoon, Ji sun c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2021/42] |
Former [2021/38] | 01 /
Yoo, Hyun Sun c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Seung Yup c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Sang Yoon c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Oh, Byung Soo c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
Jeon, Hyun-Joo c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
Cheon, So Ra c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | |||
07 /
Yoon, Ji sun c/o IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21158468.5 | 22.02.2021 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | US202062992138P | 19.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062992138 P | KR20200052545 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052545 | KR20200052546 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052546 | KR20200052548 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052548 | KR20200052554 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052554 | KR20200052555 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200052555 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881740 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3881740 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/48 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
A47K10/48 (EP);
F25B21/04 (EP);
F25B2321/0251 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/38] | English: | DRYING APPARATUS | [2021/38] | French: | APPAREIL DE SÉCHAGE | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 16.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03109593U (TAKAFUMI MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.) [A] 1,3,14* figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2010101110 (LEE DEOK GU [KR]) [A] 1,3,4,7 * paragraphs [0050] , [0073]; figures 2-7 *; | [A]CN108095625 (NANAN ZHIDE MACH EQUIP CO LTD) [A] 8,9,11 * figure 1 *; | [I]CN108514359 (ZHENG SIHANG) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-9, 19-22 *; | [I]CN108852101 (ZHENG SIHANG) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4,8-9-17-22 * |