EP4050316 - METHOD AND OBJECTS FOR SAMPLE PROCESSING AND/OR SAMPLE LABELLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MVZ Prof. Niendorf Pathologie Hamburg-West GmbH Lornsenstraße 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Braymont AG Poststrasse 30 6301 Zug / CH | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIENDORF, Axel 22301 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
UNVERHAU, Jan 8008 Zürich / CH | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Flügge, Katharina Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Alter Wall 32 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 21158959.3 | 24.02.2021 | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050316 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/06, B01L3/00, G01N1/36, // G01N1/30 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G01N1/06 (EP);
B01L3/5453 (EP);
G01N1/36 (EP);
B01L2300/021 (EP);
B01L2300/023 (EP);
B01L2300/042 (EP);
G01N1/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GEGENSTÄNDE ZUR PROBENVERARBEITUNG UND/ODER PROBENKENNZEICHNUNG | [2022/35] | English: | METHOD AND OBJECTS FOR SAMPLE PROCESSING AND/OR SAMPLE LABELLING | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉLÉMENTS DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS ET/OU À L'ÉTIQUETAGE DES ÉCHANTILLONS | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3014730 (TECHNICON INSTR) [X] 1,6,10,12,15* pages 9-10; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP0215792 (MCLEAN WILLIAM) [X] 1,6,10,12,15 * columns 2-3; figures 6, 7 *; | [X]WO2013064130 (VOGEL ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1,6,10,12,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 6] *; | [X]JP2015155873 (SHIZUOKA PREFECTURE) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035] - [0 40] - [0041]; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | - NAKHLEH et al., "Mislabeling of Cases, Specimens, Blocks, and Slides", Arch Pathol Lab Med, (20110800), vol. 135 | - TANG et al., "Patient Safety Issues in Pathology: From Mislabeled Specimens to Interpretation Errors", Vignettes in Patient Safety - Volume, (20180900), vol. 3 | - TOZBIKIAN et al., "Specimen Identification Errors in Breast Biopsies: Age matters. Report of Two Near-Miss Events and Review of the Literature", Breast J., (20170900), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 583 - 588 | - ROSAIACKERMAN'SJUAN ROSAI, ROSAI AND ACKERMAN'S Surgical Pathology, Elsevier Mosby, vol. 1, pages 1 - 95 |