EP3879493 - METHOD FOR VERIFYING AN INDIRECT VISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG Buchheimer Straße 4 91465 Ergersheim / DE | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Werner Seenheimer Straße 41 91465 Ergersheim / DE | 02 /
Centmayer, Stefan Neuherberg 3 91465 Ergersheim / DE | 03 /
Wotschal, Alexander Max-Merkel-Str. 7 91593 Burgbernheim / DE | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Alpspitz IP Longinusstraße 1 81247 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21159024.5 | 24.02.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | DE202010107016 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107016 | [2021/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879493 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/80, B60R1/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/73 (US);
H04N17/002 (US);
H04N23/58 (US);
H04N23/695 (US);
H04N23/90 (US);
H04N7/18 (CN,KR);
B60R2300/101 (KR);
B60R2300/30 (CN);
B60R2300/402 (EP,CN,KR);
B60R2300/802 (CN);
B60R2300/8066 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERIFIZIEREN EINES INDIREKTEN SICHTSYSTEMS | [2021/37] | English: | METHOD FOR VERIFYING AN INDIRECT VISION SYSTEM | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION D'UN SYSTÈME INDIRECT DE VISUALISATION | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 07.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP22197759.8 / EP4131168 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2692584 (MEKRA LANG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE102013214368 (APPLIC SOLUTIONS ELECTRONICS & VISION LTD [GB]); | [XYI]WO2017174250 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102018111776 (MOTHERSON INNOVATIONS CO LTD [GB]) | by applicant | EP2692584 | WO2017174250 | DE102018111776 |