EP3846060 - KEY VAULT ENCLAVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costa, Manuel Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/27] | 01 /
Costa, Manuel Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 21159310.8 | 20.12.2017 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | US201715414394 | 24.01.2017 Original published format: US201715414394 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846060 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3846060 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
H04L9/0894 (US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04L9/0861 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSELTRESOR-ENKLAVE | [2021/27] | English: | KEY VAULT ENCLAVE | [2021/27] | French: | ENCLAVE DE CHAMBRE FORTE À CLÉ | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17829833.7 / EP3574440 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 20.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1463322 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2015074392 (BOIVIE RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2015347768 (MARTIN JASON [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0114] *; | [A]US2016283747 (XING BIN CEDRIC [UY], et al) [A] 1-13* column 0049 - column 0056 *; | [A] - John M., "Intel Software Guard Extensions Part 3: Design an Application", (20160829), Intel, URL: https://software.intel.com/en-us/articles/software-guard-extensions-tutorial-series-part-3, (20180312), XP002779113 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Rebekah Leslie-Hurd, "Sealing and Attestation in Intel Software Guard Extensions (SGX)", Real World Crypto 2016, Stanford, CA, USA, (20160108), URL: https://rwc.iacr.org/2016/Slides/Sealing%20and%20Attestation%20in%20SGX.pdf, (20180312), XP055458283 [A] 1-13 * page 7 - page 9 * |