EP3816751 - METHOD AND DEVICE OF DETERMINING GUIDE PATH, METHOD OF CONTROLLING DRIVING OF VEHICLE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/18] | METHOD AND DEVICE OF DETERMINING GUIDE PATH, METHOD AND DEVICE OF CONTROLLING DRIVING OF VEHICLE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | ||
[2022/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/48] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Liming 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Kai 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
FENG, Jingchao 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Pengjie 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 05 /
CUI, Tianxiang 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Mingsong 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Yanting 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 08 /
SHANG, Rongjing 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 09 /
SUN, Jiaxin 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 10 /
LIU, Haitao 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 11 /
DU, Xiaochuan 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 21159571.5 | 26.02.2021 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | CN202010970793 | 15.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010970793 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816751 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816751 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G01C21/34 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G05D1/0044 (EP,KR);
G05D1/0276 (CN,KR);
G05D1/0251 (CN,KR);
B60W60/0011 (US);
B60W30/095 (US);
B60W40/072 (KR,US);
B60W50/14 (KR);
B60W60/001 (KR);
B60W60/0016 (US);
B60W60/005 (US);
G01C21/3407 (CN,KR);
G01C21/3453 (CN,KR);
G01C21/3492 (CN,KR);
G05D1/0214 (CN,KR);
B60W2050/0005 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FÜHRUNGSWEGES, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE OF DETERMINING GUIDE PATH, METHOD OF CONTROLLING DRIVING OF VEHICLE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DE TRAJECTOIRE, PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE LA CONDUITE DE VEHICULE, ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/18] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FÜHRUNGSWEGES, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | ||
Former [2021/18] | METHOD AND DEVICE OF DETERMINING GUIDE PATH, METHOD AND DEVICE OF CONTROLLING DRIVING OF VEHICLE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | ||
Former [2021/18] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DE TRAJET, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE LA CONDUITE DE VEHICULE, ET APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | IE | 26.02.2023 | LU | 26.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2023 | ||
LU | 26.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2023 | ||
LU | 26.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2018232032 (NUTONOMY INC [US]); | [Y]US2019196464 (LOCKWOOD AMANDA LEE KELLY [US], et al); | [XY]US2020004240 (BIEHLER MARTIN [DE], et al) |