EP3882175 - BLISTER PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guenther, Lara Dawn Werstener Dorfstraße 29 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21159811.5 | 01.03.2021 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | DE202010107120 | 16.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107120 | [2021/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882175 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D73/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B65D73/0092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLISTERVERPACKUNG | [2021/38] | English: | BLISTER PACKAGING | [2021/38] | French: | EMBALLAGE BLISTER | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009272670 (PETRELLI J ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1(a),1(b), 2(a) * [I] 2,3,9; | [A]DE102004020476 (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US3467248 (MAKOWICKI JAMES M) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |