EP3848805 - WARM START TECHNIQUE FOR CLOUD-HOSTED FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Cloud Computing Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Cloud Data Center Jiaoxinggong Road Qianzhong Avenue Gui'an New District Guizhou 550025 / CN | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Hong c/o Futurewei Technologies, Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive, Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 02 /
Fourie, Henry Louis c/o Futurewei Technologies, Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive, Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 03 /
Sunavala, Farhad P. c/o Futurewei Technologies, Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive, Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21160109.1 | 31.08.2018 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201762553637P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553637 P | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 Original published format: US201815878318 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848805 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/5041 (US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
G06F9/5072 (EP);
G06F9/547 (US);
H04L41/147 (US);
H04L41/5048 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45562 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | WARMSTARTTECHNIK FÜR CLOUD-GEHOSTETE FUNKTIONEN | [2021/28] | English: | WARM START TECHNIQUE FOR CLOUD-HOSTED FUNCTIONS | [2021/28] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE DÉMARRAGE À CHAUD POUR DES FONCTIONS HÉBERGÉES EN NUAGE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18804218.8 / EP3475856 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016188377 (THIMMAPPA MOHAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2017090961 (WAGNER TIMOTHY ALLEN [US], et al); | [X]US2017177860 (SUAREZ ANTHONY JOSEPH [US], et al) |