EP3901779 - VIDEO DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM INCLUDING PROGRESSIVE PLAYBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIVX, LLC 4350 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 950 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osborne, Roland 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 21160147.1 | 07.01.2008 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | US200788365907P | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 88365907 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3901779 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3901779 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04N21/234, G06F16/738, G06F16/71, // H04N5/76, H04N5/783, H04N7/173, H04N7/24, H04N21/472, H04N21/44, H04N21/6587, H04N7/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04L65/764 (US);
G06F16/71 (EP,US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04N21/23406 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | G06F15/16, H04N21/234, G06F16/738, G06F16/71, // H04N5/76, H04N5/783, H04N7/173, H04N7/24, H04L29/06, H04N21/472, H04N21/44, H04N21/6587, H04N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VIDEOVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM MIT PROGRESSIVER WIEDERGABE | [2021/43] | English: | VIDEO DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM INCLUDING PROGRESSIVE PLAYBACK | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION VIDÉO COMPRENANT UNE LECTURE PROGRESSIVE | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 08.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08705745.1 / EP2122482 | EP18206048.3 / EP3467666 | Divisional application(s) | EP22199792.7 / EP4184341 | EP23156805.6 / EP4213033 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | IE | 07.01.2023 | LU | 07.01.2023 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2023 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2023 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2023 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2023 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NO | 26.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003111048 (NTT SOFTWARE CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1534013 (ONKYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2006037057 (XU SHUGONG [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * | by applicant | US20050322604 | EP20080705745 | EP20180206048 | WO2008US50440 | US20080016184 | US20080198142 | US20080323044 | US20080323062 | US20080327543 |