EP4054143 - AUTHENTIFICATION OF A DEVICE IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK OF AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Görbing, Andrej 10318 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hurrelmann, Jonas 13347 Berlin / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21160205.7 | 02.03.2021 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054143 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, // H04L12/40 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/083 (CN);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04L1/22 (CN);
H04L12/40176 (EP);
H04L41/0668 (US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,CN);
H04L63/0876 (CN);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04L67/1095 (EP);
H04W88/08 (US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIEREN EINES GERÄTES IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ EINER AUTOMATISIERUNGSANLAGE | [2022/36] | English: | AUTHENTIFICATION OF A DEVICE IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK OF AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM | [2022/36] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN APPAREIL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION D'UNE INSTALLATION D'AUTOMATISATION | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 04.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004128393 (BLAKLEY GEORGE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0058]; figures 1C,1D,1E *; | [XI]US2010299313 (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0089] - [0105]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0201] - [0214]; figures 13-15 * [I] 2,6,9,13; | [A] - WEERATHUNGA PUBUDU EROSHAN, "Securing IEDs against cyber threats in critical substation automation and industrial control systems", 2017 70TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE FOR PROTECTIVE RELAY ENGINEERS (CPRE), IEEE, (20170403), doi:10.1109/CPRE.2017.8090048, pages 1 - 20, XP033244011 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [08.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CPRE.2017.8090048 | [A] - "Industrial communication networks - High availability automation networks - Part 1: General concepts and calculation methods", IEC 62439-1:2010+AMD1:2012+AMD2:2016 CSV, IEC, 3, RUE DE VAREMBÉ, PO BOX 131, CH-1211 GENEVA 20, SWITZERLAND, (20160225), pages 1 - 255, XP082001689 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [04.1] * * paragraphs [0005] - [05.4]; figures 11,12 * | by applicant | EP2148473 |