EP3878905 - TIRE TREAD RUBBER COMPOSITION , TIRE TREAD, AND TIRE FOR PASSENGER CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-0072 / JP | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIMO, Masaki c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21160212.3 | 02.03.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | JP20200041240 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020041240 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878905 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3878905 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/06, B60C1/00, C08L7/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08K5/548, C08L25/16 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,CN);
C08L9/06 (EP,CN);
C08L7/00 (EP,CN);
C08L9/00 (CN);
C08L2205/02 (CN);
C08L2205/025 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L9/06, C08L25/16, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/00, C08L25/16, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/06, C08L25/16, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/06, C08L91/00, C08L25/16, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L25/16, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08K5/548, C08K13/02 (CN);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L25/16, C08L9/06, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/06, C08L91/00, C08L25/16, C08L91/06, C08L45/00, C08K5/18, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K3/22 (EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REIFENLAUFFLÄCHENZUSAMMENSETZUNG, REIFENLAUFFLÄCHE UND REIFEN FÜR PERSONENKRAFTWAGEN | [2021/37] | English: | TIRE TREAD RUBBER COMPOSITION , TIRE TREAD, AND TIRE FOR PASSENGER CAR | [2021/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR BANDE DE ROULEMENT DE PNEU, BANDE DE ROULEMENT DE PNEU ET PNEU POUR VOITURE DE TOURISME | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/05] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2016094552 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]EP3450206 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]CA3074175 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | Examination | EP3882045 | EP3882046 | by applicant | JP2011246561 |