EP3885274 - PACKAGING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING A PRODUCT WITH PACKAGING PRODUCED FROM AN UPPER PAPER SHEET AND A LOWER PAPER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beck Packautomaten GmbH & Co. KG Steinbeisstrasse 9 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumayer, Ulrich c/o Beck Packautomaten GmbH & Co. KG Steinbeisstrasse 9 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | 02 /
Beck-Deharde, Beate c/o Beck Packautomaten GmbH & Co. KG Steinbeisstrasse 9 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21160299.0 | 02.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | DE202010106025 | 05.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020106025 | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3885274 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3885274 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885274 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/02, B29C65/00, B65B51/16, B65B51/26, B65B51/30, B65B41/12 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
B65B9/02 (EP);
B65B41/12 (EP);
B65B51/16 (EP);
B65B51/26 (EP);
B65B51/30 (EP);
B65B51/303 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | B65B9/02, B29C65/00, // B65B51/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN EINES PACKGUTS MIT EINER AUS EINER OBEREN PAPIERBAHN UND EINER UNTEREN PAPIERBAHN ERZEUGTEN UMVERPACKUNG | [2021/39] | English: | PACKAGING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING A PRODUCT WITH PACKAGING PRODUCED FROM AN UPPER PAPER SHEET AND A LOWER PAPER SHEET | [2021/39] | French: | MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE D'UN PRODUIT À EMBALLER AVEC UN EMBALLAGE EXTÉRIEUR PRODUIT À PARTIR D'UNE BANDE SUPÉRIEURE DE PAPIER ET D'UNE BANDE INFÉRIEURE DE PAPIER | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3552088 (NIWA AKIRA); | [Y]US3874976 (MACFARLAND JR RAYMOND); | [Y]DE2512005 (BECK & CO PACKAUTOMATEN); | [Y]US4219988 (KING FRANCIS X JR [US], et al); | [Y]US5956931 (STORK BRIAN R [US]); | [XY]DE10021470 (DIEZ WERNER [DE]); | [A]EP1396428 (SEALED AIR CORP [US]); | [Y]DE10309923 (MAF VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102005033775 (BECK & CO PACKAUTOMATEN [DE]); | [Y]DE202014003582U (KALLFASS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202016005970U (KALLFASS VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE102015122560 (BECK PACKAUTOMATEN GMBH + CO KG [DE]); | [YD]DE102017131026 (BECK PACKAUTOMATEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | DE102006001594 | DE102017131026 | DE202019105885U |