EP4053530 - PIEZOELECTRIC BASED SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/36] | PIEZOELECTRIC BASED SENSORS AND MANUFACTURING METHODS | ||
[2024/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidria d.o.o. Spodnja Kanomlja 23 5281 Spodnja Idrija / SI | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states HIDRIA d.o.o. Nazorjeva ulica 6a 1000 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROVSCEK, Domen 5216 MOST NA SOCI / SI | 02 /
PODOBNIK, Aljaz 5220 TOLMIN / SI | 03 /
BERGINC, Bostjan 5000 NOVA GORICA / SI | 04 /
URSIC, Peter 5222 KOBARID / SI | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 35, rue Lancefoc 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21160310.5 | 02.03.2021 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053530 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4053530 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/08, G01L19/04, G01L1/16 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G01L9/085 (EP);
G01L1/16 (EP);
G01L19/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | G01L9/08, G01L19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRIK BASIERENDE SENSOREN | [2024/02] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC BASED SENSORS | [2024/02] | French: | CAPTEURS À BASE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/36] | AUF PIEZOELEKTRIK BASIERENDE SENSOREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2022/36] | PIEZOELECTRIC BASED SENSORS AND MANUFACTURING METHODS | ||
Former [2022/36] | CAPTEURS À BASE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | Examination procedure | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1108846 (KISTLER INSTRUMENTE AG); | [I]US5777239 (FUGLEWICZ DANIEL P [US]); | [A]US10245064 (RHEE SORA [US], et al) | by applicant | GB1108846 |