EP3848092 - APPARATUS, METHOD, AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVELY EFFECTING AND/OR KILLING BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDERS-PEHRSON, Gerhard 113 Hawkes Avenue Ossining, New York 10562 / US | 02 /
BRENNER, David Jonathan 139 West 82nd St. Apt. 9G New York, New York 10024 / US | 03 /
BIGELOW, Alan 117 East 77th Street Apt. 5C New York, New York 10075 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21160484.8 | 07.03.2012 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201161450038P | 07.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161450038 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848092 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
A61N5/0624 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61L2/0047 (US);
A61L9/20 (EP);
A61N5/0601 (US);
A61B2018/1807 (US);
A61N2005/0654 (US);
A61N2005/0655 (US);
A61N2005/0661 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SELEKTIVEN BEEINFLUSSEN UND/ODER TÖTEN VON BAKTERIEN | [2021/28] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD, AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVELY EFFECTING AND/OR KILLING BACTERIA | [2021/28] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR S'ATTAQUER À DES BACTÉRIES ET/OU LES TUER, DE MANIÈRE SÉLECTIVE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 14.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12755325.3 / EP2683442 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4909254 (WILKINSON FRANK J [AU]); | [Y]EP1469290 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]US2007135874 (BALA JOHN L [US]); |