EP3848120 - NOX ABSORBER CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAN-MARTIN, Desiree Blounts Court Road Sonning Common Reading, Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | 02 /
RAJARAM, Raj Rao Blounts Court Road Sonning Common Reading, Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Johnson Matthey Plc Intellectual Property Department Belasis Avenue Billingham TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Wilson, Nicola Ann Patent Attorney@Johnson Matthey Publ.Ltd Comp. Intell. Property Dept.@Johnson Matthey Techn. Ctr. Blount's Court Road Sonning Common, Reading Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | Application number, filing date | 21160547.2 | 22.09.2017 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | GB20160016811 | 04.10.2016 Original published format: GB 201616811 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848120 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01J37/02, B01J23/00, B01J23/58, B01D53/94, B01J35/04, B01J37/00 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B01D53/9422 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D53/94 (GB,RU);
B01J23/63 (EP,GB,KR,RU,US);
B01D53/9409 (GB);
B01D53/9413 (GB);
B01D53/9427 (GB);
B01D53/9477 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,GB,US);
B01J23/40 (RU);
B01J23/42 (GB,RU);
B01J23/44 (GB,RU);
B01J23/58 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C01F17/235 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (KR,US);
F01N3/0842 (KR,US);
F01N3/2066 (KR,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D2255/2061 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/91 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,GB,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NOX ABSORBER KATALYSATOR | [2021/28] | English: | NOX ABSORBER CATALYST | [2021/28] | French: | CATALYSEUR ADSORBEUR DE NOX | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17777348.8 / EP3548177 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0613714 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-13 * example - * * tables 5,6 * * claim - * [I] 1-13; | [XI]US2009084090 (NAKATSUJI TADAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0066] , [0067] , [0069] * * example - * [I] 1-13; | [I] - Samantha Jones, "University of Kentucky UKnowledge Theses and Dissertations--Chemistry Chemistry 2016 Ceria Based Catalysts for Low Temperature NO x Storage and Release", doi:10.13023/ETD.2016.379, (20160726), URL: https://uknowledge.uky.edu/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?referer=https://www.google.de/&httpsredir=1&article=1073&context=chemistry_etds, (20171127), XP055428823 [I] 1-13 * Chapter 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13023/ETD.2016.379 | by applicant | EP1027919 | WO2004076829 | WO2008047170 | - Applied Catalysis B: Environmental, (19950000), vol. 5, pages 367 - 376 |