EP4054058 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agafonov, Aleksei 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21160630.6 | 04.03.2021 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054058 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/80, H02J50/90 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/36] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER | [2022/36] | French: | TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2985853 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) |