EP3854229 - SMOKING ARTICLE WITH A MOUTH END CAVITY AND VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADIRIC, Alen Brunnmatt 9 2552 Orpund / CH | 02 /
LINDHOLM DELALOYE, Cecilia Chemin des Uttins 4 1028 Préverenges / CH | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Parsi Mendiola, Joshua Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21160794.0 | 24.03.2016 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | EP20150161533 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15161533 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854229 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/04, A24D3/10, // A24D3/17 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A24D3/04 (EP,RU,US);
A24D3/043 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A24D1/045 (CN);
A24D1/002 (CN);
A24D1/02 (CN);
A24D3/048 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RAUCHARTIKEL MIT EINEM MUNDENDHOHLRAUM UND ENTLÜFTUNG | [2021/30] | English: | SMOKING ARTICLE WITH A MOUTH END CAVITY AND VENTILATION | [2021/30] | French: | ARTICLE À FUMER AVEC CAVITÉ D'EXTRÉMITÉ BUCCALE ET VENTILATION | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16714341.1 / EP3273808 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2013068337 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-5,12,14,15 * figure - * * page 6, line 35 - page 9, line 4 * [Y] 7-11 [I] 6,13; | [Y]WO2014023557 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [Y] 7,8,11 * figure - * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 31 *; | [Y]WO2014102094 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 1, 2 ** page 10, line 18 - line 34 *; | [XA]WO2014158051 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,12-15 * figure - * * page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 34 * [A] 2-11 |