EP3885352 - A COMPOUND, COMPOSITIONS THEREOF AND THIS COMPOUND FOR USE IN METHODS OF TREATING CNS DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sage Therapeutics, Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ BOTELLA, Gabriel 17 Parmenter Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 02 /
SALITURO, Francesco G. 25 Baker Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
ROBICHAUD, Albert Jean 2 Earhart Street 915 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 04 /
HARRISON, Boyd L. 9 Wheatston Court Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Coles, Andrea Birgit, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21160969.8 | 16.10.2015 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | US201462064961P | 16.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462064961 P | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885352 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07J43/00, C07J9/00, A61K31/58, A61P23/00, A61P25/20, A61P25/08, A01N51/00, A61K31/575, A61K45/06, A61P25/00, A61P25/06, A61P25/14, A61P25/18, A61P25/28, // C07J1/00, C07J3/00, C07J5/00, C07J7/00, C07J11/00, C07J13/00, C07J21/00, C07J31/00, C07J41/00, C07J51/00, C07J71/00 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/57 (RU);
A61K31/58 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P23/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/06 (EP,IL);
A61P25/08 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P25/20 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,RU);
C07J1/0011 (EP,IL,US);
C07J1/0022 (EP,IL,US);
C07J11/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07J13/007 (EP,IL,US);
C07J21/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07J3/005 (EP,IL,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,IL,US);
C07J41/0066 (EP,IL,US);
C07J5/0053 (EP,IL,US);
C07J51/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07J7/00 (RU);
C07J7/002 (EP,IL,US);
C07J7/007 (EP,IL,US);
C07J7/008 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.03.2022 | ME | 24.03.2022 | Title | German: | EINE VERBINDUNG, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON UND DIESE VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STÖRUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | [2021/39] | English: | A COMPOUND, COMPOSITIONS THEREOF AND THIS COMPOUND FOR USE IN METHODS OF TREATING CNS DISORDERS | [2021/39] | French: | UN COMPOSÉ, SES COMPOSITIONS ET CE COMPOSÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 24.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15851530.4 / EP3206494 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9805337 (COCENSYS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0066614 (COCENSYS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5232917 | US5376645 | WO2013112605 | WO2014031792 |