EP3882572 - SINGLE-DIFFERENCE BASED PRE-FILTER OF MEASUREMENTS FOR USE IN SOLUTION SEPARATION FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANA, Zdenek HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 02 /
SOTAK, Milos HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 03 /
VAISPACHER, Tomas HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21161136.3 | 05.03.2021 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | US202016823199 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: US202016823199 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882572 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G01C21/20, G01S19/07, G01C21/16, G01S19/47, G01S19/49, G01S19/20 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
G01C21/20 (EP);
G01S19/393 (US);
G01C21/005 (EP);
G01C21/165 (EP);
G01C21/188 (EP);
G01S19/14 (US);
G01S19/20 (EP);
G01S19/42 (US);
G01S19/47 (EP);
G01S19/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF EINZELDIFFERENZ BASIERENDER VORFILTER FÜR MESSUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN LÖSUNGSTRENNUNGSRAHMEN | [2021/38] | English: | SINGLE-DIFFERENCE BASED PRE-FILTER OF MEASUREMENTS FOR USE IN SOLUTION SEPARATION FRAMEWORK | [2021/38] | French: | PRÉFILTRE DE MESURES À SIMPLE DIFFÉRENCE À UTILISER DANS UN CADRE DE SÉPARATION DE SOLUTIONS | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009146873 (VANDERWERF KEVIN [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] *; | [XI]US2011115669 (MILYUTIN DANIEL [RU], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0041] , [ 131]; figure 1; claims 1, 6, 7 * [I] 3-5,9; | [X] - OFFER C R ET AL, "Use of Inertial Integration to Enhance Availability for Shipboard Relative GPS (SRGPS)", GNSS 2006 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 19TH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GNSS 2006), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20060929), pages 726 - 737, XP056009869 [X] 1,7 * page 732 - page 733; figure 5 * | [X] - LIANG XIAO ET AL, "GNSS Multi-Frequency Multi-System Highly Robust Differential Positioning Based on an Autonomous Fault Detection and Exclusion Method", IEEE ACCESS, (20171101), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2768576, pages 26842 - 26851, XP011674764 [X] 1,7 * II. HIGH-PRECISION DIFFERENTIAL POSITIONING; page 26843 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2768576 |