EP3848567 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE BUFFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNSELL, Peter M. 12 Candlewood Lane Granby CT 06035 / US | 02 /
STRIPINIS, Phillip S. 164 Farms Village Road Rocky Hill CT 06067 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21161359.1 | 15.01.2013 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201213362307 | 31.01.2012 Original published format: US201213362307 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848567 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3848567 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/08, F01D11/06, // F02C7/28, F02C7/06 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
F02C6/08 (EP,US);
F01D11/04 (US);
F01D11/06 (EP,US);
F01D25/125 (EP,US);
F02C7/047 (EP);
F02C9/18 (US);
F02C7/06 (EP,US);
F02C7/28 (EP,US);
F05D2260/601 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PUFFERSYSTEM FÜR GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2021/28] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE BUFFER SYSTEM | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈME TAMPON DE MOTEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13744090.5 / EP2809906 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2698406 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007243811 (ALECU DANIEL T [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] *[I] 11; | [Y]EP2119892 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] * |