EP3889408 - REGULATED FLOW DIVIDER VALVES WITH SECONDARY EQUALIZATION VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUTAR, Matej 95 Briarwood Drive Manchester, CT Connecticut 06050 / US | 02 /
MAROCCHINI, Francis P. 104 Pond Circle Somers, CT Connecticut 06071 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21161473.0 | 09.03.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | US202063002070P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063002070 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889408 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889408 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/228, F02C9/34 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
F02C7/228 (EP,US);
F02C9/263 (US);
F02C9/34 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2270/051 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEREGELTE STRÖMUNGSTEILERVENTILE MIT SEKUNDÄREN AUSGLEICHSVENTILEN | [2021/40] | English: | REGULATED FLOW DIVIDER VALVES WITH SECONDARY EQUALIZATION VALVES | [2021/40] | French: | SOUPAPES DISTRIBUTRICES RÉGULÉES AVEC SOUPAPES D'ÉGALISATION SECONDAIRES | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 04.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5339636 (DONNELLY BRIAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 26 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007245744 (DOOLEY KEVIN A [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] * * figure 2 *; | [XI]US2010050593 (FUTA PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0034] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 5-7,11-13; | [A]EP2535644 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0037] * * figures 2-4 * |