EP4056304 - BORING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERATIZIT Balzheim GmbH & Co. KG Carl-Otto-Weg 21 88481 Balzheim / DE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALCHER, Rainer 88481 Balzheim / DE | 02 /
LUIBRAND, Peter 88481 Balzheim / DE | 03 /
RAPP, Oliver 88481 Balzheim / DE | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Ciesla, Dirk Plansee Group Service GmbH IP Department Metallwerk-Plansee-Strasse 71 6600 Reutte / AT | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 21161913.5 | 11.03.2021 | [2022/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056304 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02, B23B51/08, B23D77/00 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
B23D77/00 (EP);
B23B51/02 (EP);
B23B51/08 (EP);
B23B2222/14 (EP);
B23B2251/14 (EP);
B23B2251/406 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRWERKZEUG | [2022/37] | English: | BORING TOOL | [2022/37] | French: | OUTIL DE FORAGE | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0901860 (SPHINX WERKZEUGE AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,5,6,9* the whole document *; | [Y]DE10144241 (MILLER GMBH PRAEZ SWERKZEUGE [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102012002050 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,2,5 * | by applicant | EP1622735 |