EP4056771 - WATER TAP AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE WATER TAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITA SE Heinz-Hankammer-Straße 1 65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states Brita GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 4 65232 Taunusstein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHUI, Oliver 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
STIEHL, Gregor 65597 Hünfelden / DE | 03 /
HEGER, Johann 60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 21162004.2 | 11.03.2021 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056771 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/05 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
E03C1/041 (EP,US);
E03C1/0411 (EP);
E03C1/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERHAHN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DES WASSERHAHNS | [2022/37] | English: | WATER TAP AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE WATER TAP | [2022/37] | French: | ROBINET D'EAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE ROBINET D'EAU | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2841657 (HENRI PETERI BEHEER BV [NL]); | [Y]US2015322651 (GNAUERT WERNER [DE], et al); | [XYI]EP3766828 (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |