EP3905002 - POCT INSTRUMENT AND POCT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELGRANDE, Diego 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 02 /
PORSCH, Ulrich 68305 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
SUTER, Nina 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 04 /
WILHELMS, Mathias 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Ko, Benjamin Hyensuk Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 21162493.7 | 15.03.2021 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | EP20200164926 | 23.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20164926 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905002 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, A61B90/00, G16H10/40, G16H40/00, G02F1/167, A61B5/00, G16H40/63 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G06F1/165 (EP);
A61B5/1468 (CN);
G16H10/40 (US);
A61B5/14532 (CN);
A61B5/742 (EP,CN);
A61B5/7475 (EP);
A61B90/90 (CN);
G06F1/263 (US);
G06F21/31 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP);
A61B2560/0443 (EP);
H04M2250/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POCT-INSTRUMENT UND POCT-SYSTEM | [2021/44] | English: | POCT INSTRUMENT AND POCT SYSTEM | [2021/44] | French: | INSTRUMENT POCT ET SYSTÈME POCT | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 03.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008220814 (HEDTKE PAUL [US], et al); | [A]WO2012044201 (RAWLLIN INT INC, et al); | [Y]EP2541370 (HAND HELD PROD INC [US]); | [Y]EP3091460 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) | by applicant | US5961804 |