EP3886319 - AUDIO DEVICE AND AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka, 430-8650 / JP | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROSAKA, Yuumi Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
KOSUGE, Katsumasa Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Takanori Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Emil-Riedel-Straße 18 80538 München / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21163232.8 | 17.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | JP20200053921 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020053921 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886319 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/00, H03G7/00, H03G9/18, G06F1/26, G06F1/3206 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H03G3/007 (EP);
H04R3/00 (CN);
H03G3/3005 (US);
G06F1/266 (EP);
G06F1/3215 (EP);
G06F1/324 (EP);
G06F1/3278 (EP);
G06F1/3296 (EP);
H03G7/002 (EP);
H03G7/007 (EP);
H03G9/18 (EP);
H04R29/001 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUDIOSIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [2021/39] | English: | AUDIO DEVICE AND AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD | [2021/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 24.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003030412 (MATSUDA KUNIAKI [JP], et al); | [I]US2004151336 (HAN TOM [TW], et al); | [XI]US2010322438 (SIOTIS GEORG [SE]); | [A]EP2908209 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US10285081 (BARTELS PETER J [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2016225913 |