EP3889059 - STORAGE AND TRANSPORT PALLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schake GmbH Eckeseyer Straße 195 58089 Hagen / DE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schake, Gerald Auf der Waldbredde 2 b 58300 Wetter / DE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21163495.1 | 18.03.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | DE202020101820U | 03.04.2020 Original published format: DE 202020101820 U | [2021/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3889059 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3889059 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/06, B65D19/10, B65D19/38, B65D19/40 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B65D19/06 (EP);
B65D19/10 (EP);
B65D19/38 (EP);
B65D19/40 (EP);
B65D2203/10 (EP);
B65D2519/00024 (EP);
B65D2519/00029 (EP);
B65D2519/00034 (EP);
B65D2519/00273 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (EP);
B65D2519/00298 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00338 (EP);
B65D2519/00502 (EP);
B65D2519/00512 (EP);
B65D2519/00606 (EP);
B65D2519/00641 (EP);
B65D2519/00676 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGER- UND TRANSPORTPALETTE | [2021/40] | English: | STORAGE AND TRANSPORT PALLET | [2021/40] | French: | PALETTE DE STOCKAGE ET DE TRANSPORT | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2538377 (WUERTH IND SERVICE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1,2,5-9,11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 7,8 * [Y] 3,4,10; | [IY]EP1635290 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [I] 1,2,5-9,11 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0211]; figures 1-5,15 * [Y] 3,4,10; | [Y]CN110712832 (SONG LEI) [Y] 3,4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2008135506 (PETERS ROGER [US], et al) [Y] 10 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102010045749 (STILL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3536914 | DE9419468U |