EP3930271 - ROUTING ENGINE SWITCHOVER BASED ON HEALTH DETERMINED BY SUPPORT VECTOR MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEOG, Ankur Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
MISHRA, Sanjeev Kumar Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
Mathews, Santosh Kottainipral Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21163795.4 | 19.03.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | IN202041026662 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: IN202041026662 | US202017247891 | 29.12.2020 Original published format: US202017247891 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930271 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930271 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/58, H04L41/0668, H04L41/16, H04L43/0817, // H04L43/10 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H04L45/58 (EP);
H04L45/14 (CN);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G06F18/2411 (CN);
G06N20/10 (CN);
H04L41/0668 (EP);
H04L41/16 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (EP);
H04L45/22 (CN);
H04L43/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H04L12/775, H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROUTING-MASCHINENUMSCHALTUNG BASIEREND AUF DEM VON EINER UNTERSTÜTZUNGSVEKTORMASCHINE BESTIMMTEN GESUNDHEITSZUSTAND | [2021/52] | English: | ROUTING ENGINE SWITCHOVER BASED ON HEALTH DETERMINED BY SUPPORT VECTOR MACHINE | [2021/52] | French: | COMMUTATION DE MOTEUR DE ROUTAGE BASÉE SUR LA SANTÉ DÉTERMINÉE PAR UNE MACHINE À VECTEUR DE SUPPORT | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 24.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013332399 (REDDY RAJASHEKAR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 6A, 6B, 7, 8A * * paragraphs [0002] - [0017] - [0 82] - [0112] *; | [I]US9491107 (SCUDDER JOHN GALEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 12 - line 27 * * column 2, line 42 - line 61 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 64 * * column 7, line 29 - line 38 * * column 8, line 62 - column 10, line 29 * * column 11, line 3 - line 10 *; | [A]US2019020555 (TAYAL CHIRAG [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0 11] , [0 24] - [0028] - [0 33] , [0 38] , [0 42] , [0 49] * |