EP3940862 - INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR VOLTAGE ACQUISITION AND BATTERY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dongguan Guixiang Insulation Material Co., Ltd No. 57, Muyu Road Shatou Community Chang 'an Town Dongguan, Guangdong / CN | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Huaming Ji 'an, Jiangxi / CN | 02 /
DAI, Zhite Changsha, Hunan / CN | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Ipey Apex House Thomas Street Trethomas Caerphilly CF83 8DP / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21163837.4 | 19.03.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | CN202021366682U | 13.07.2020 Original published format: CN 202021366682 U | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940862 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H01M10/4207 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP);
H01M50/502 (EP);
H01M50/519 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPANNUNGSERFASSUNG UND BATTERIEÜBERWACHUNG | [2022/03] | English: | INTEGRATED DEVICE FOR VOLTAGE ACQUISITION AND BATTERY MONITORING | [2022/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ POUR L'ACQUISITION DE LA TENSION ET LA SURVEILLANCE DE LA BATTERIE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN208386188U (GEELY AUTOMOBILE RES INSTITUTE NINGBO CO LTD, et al); | [XYI]US2019088912 (GOH SIOW-PHENG [SG], et al) |