EP3885671 - SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE TEMPERATURE OF A CRYOGENIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Absolut System 3 avenue Raymond Chanas 38320 Eybens / FR | [2024/40] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Absolut System 2 Rue des Murailles 38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANCHON, Julien 2 rue des Bleuets 38180 SEYSSINS / FR | 02 /
LACAPERE, Jerome 65 Route du Crest 38960 ST ETIENNE DE CROSSEY / FR | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21164132.9 | 23.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | FR20200002909 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2002909 | [2021/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885671 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, F25B9/08, F25B23/00 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
F25B9/002 (EP);
F25B23/006 (EP);
F25B9/08 (EP);
F25B2341/0012 (EP);
F25B2400/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR TEMPERATURREGELUNG EINES KRYOGENEN FLUIDS | [2021/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE TEMPERATURE OF A CRYOGENIC FLUID | [2021/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA TEMPERATURE D'UN FLUIDE CRYOGENIQUE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 07.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 02.02.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 10.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3442093 (RIETDIJK JOHAN ANDRIAAN); | [X]FR1573734 ; | [A]US3932158 (HILDEBRANDT ULLRICH) |