EP3858196 - A CHAIR AND COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Formway Furniture Limited 43b Seaview Road Lower Hutt, Wellington 5010 / NZ | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Kent Wallace 61 Cheviot Road Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt / NZ | 02 /
COLLINGS, Martyn Walter Goodwin 5/143 Cockayne Road Khandallah, Wellington / NZ | 03 /
O'HARA, Wayne Douglas 7/222 Jackson Street Petone, Lower Hutt / NZ | 04 /
YOUNG, Aaron Michael 28a Hathaway Avenue Lower Hutt / NZ | 05 /
STEVENSON, Paul James Apartment 589, 233 Cuba Street Te Aro, Wellington / NZ | 06 /
BATEMAN, Gavin James 37 Gladys Scott Place Tawa, Wellington / NZ | 07 /
LIN, Kai Xi 76B Tasman Street Mount Cook, Wellington / NZ | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/38] |
Former [2021/31] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21164396.0 | 03.02.2017 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | NZ20130167167 | 05.02.2016 Original published format: NZ 16716713 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858196 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3858196 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/024, A47C3/027, A47C3/12, A47C7/44 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A47C1/024 (EP,CN);
A47C7/44 (EP,CN,US);
A47C3/0252 (CN,US);
A47C1/02 (US);
A47C1/03277 (EP);
A47C3/02 (CN,US);
A47C3/025 (CN,US);
A47C3/0255 (CN,US);
A47C3/027 (EP,CN,US);
A47C3/12 (EP,CN);
A47C5/12 (US);
A47C7/029 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STUHL UND KOMPONENTEN | [2021/31] | English: | A CHAIR AND COMPONENTS | [2021/31] | French: | CHAISE ET SES COMPOSANTS | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/31] | CHAISE ET COMPOSANTS | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 17.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17747853.4 / EP3410892 | Divisional application(s) | EP23191610.7 / EP4252590 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2763318 (HARRY BERTOIA); | [XI]EP0210710 (CHI CHING CHU [TW], et al); | [X]EP0982180 (STREUBER SULO EISENWERK F [DE]); | [A]US2003088900 (CHO MAN-HEE [KR]); | [A]USD726431S (YE GENLIN [CN]) | Examination | US2015320220 |